Trustees THE GUILD OF PASTORAL PSYCHOLOGY
Charity number: 212662

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Scott | Chair | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Louise Taylor | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Ouertani | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynne Radomsky | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Anthony Newman | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leslie Ellis Oglesby Revd Canon | Trustee | 21 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Gay Adkins | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
TOBY SIMS | Trustee | 12 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR JIM KEELING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOMINQUE KEELING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.