STIBBARD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support the elderly and infirm in the Parish. Be available to donate emergency charitable financial donations to those Parishioners thought suitable by Trustees. To consider financial support for refurbishment or repair of items considered to enhance the fabric of the village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Norfolk
Governance
- 04 December 1962: Standard registration
- STIBBARD CHARITY TRUSTEES (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR PIERS REINHOLD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kevin Rogers | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Cook | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gasson Dr | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN JOSEPHINE DUGDALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN JEAN MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £820 | £2.48k | £1.70k | £2.50k | £1.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50 | £0 | £1.15k | £1.60k | £2.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2024 | 345 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 25 APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
1)IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR RECREATIONAL FACILITIES 2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STIBBARD, IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK
Linked charities
- 04 December 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLLY FARM HOUSE
WOOD NORTON ROAD
STIBBARD
FAKENHAM
NR21 0EX
- Phone:
- 01328829295
- Email:
- piersreinhold@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window