Governing document THE COLLEGE OF PSYCHIC STUDIES

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 AUG 1896 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 APR 1955 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAY 1955 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 MAY 1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 JUL 1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 JUN 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 DEC 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 APR 2013
Charitable objects
TO SEEK, COLLECT AND OBTAIN INFORMATION RESPECTING, AND GENERALLY TO INVESTIGATE, THE PHENOMENA COMMONLY KNOWN AS PSYCHIC, INCLUDING ALL MATTERS OF A KINDRED NATURE, AND IN PARTICULAR TO STUDY THE APPLICATION TO THE SUBJECT OF SURVIVAL AND COMMUNICATION WITH THE DISCARNATE AND TO DISSEMINATE THE KNOWLEDGE GAINED THEREBY.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.