CANDIDATES FOR ORDINATION FUND OF THE GUILD OF SERVANTS OF THE SANCTUARY

Charity Number: 212729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £10,819
Total expenditure: £19,138

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Farmer Trustee 23 April 2022
GUILD OF SERVANTS OF THE SANCTUARY
Received: On time
Michael Andrew Trustee 08 February 2020
Rhondda Ministry Area
Received: On time
GUILD OF SERVANTS OF THE SANCTUARY
Received: On time
HOWARD GADD TRUST
Received: On time
Father Darren Smith SSC Trustee 13 June 2012
GENERAL TRUST FUND OF THE CHURCH UNION
Received: On time
THE HARRY AND KATIE POLLARD TRUST
Received: 70 days late
GUILD OF SERVANTS OF THE SANCTUARY
Received: On time
COLIN SQUIRES Trustee 13 June 2012
HOWARD GADD TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.52k £10.45k £10.24k £10.52k £10.82k
Total expenditure £11.34k £16.02k £15.50k £18.65k £19.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Southdene
Slimbridge Road
BURGESS HILL
RH15 8QE
Phone:
01444244737
Email:
No information available
Website:

guild-of-servers-of-sanctaury.weebly.com