SHROPSHIRE WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit to safeguard and enhance biodiversity and sustainability and in particular 1. to undertake and promote the conservation of wildlife species and their habitats including the maintenance, restoration and creation of such habitats;0001
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,315,000
Donations and legacies | £752.00k | |
Charitable activities | £2.42m | |
Other trading activities | £128.00k | |
Investments | £20.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,176,000
Raising funds | £264.00k | |
Charitable activities | £2.91m | |
Other | £0 |
£5,139 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £20,304 from 1 government contract(s) and £250,290 from 9 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £264.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.91m | |
Retained for future use | £139.00k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £264.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.91m | |
Retained for future use | £144.14k |
People

54 Employee(s)
16 Trustee(s)
350 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 07 January 1963: Standard registration
- THE SHROPSHIRE CONSERVATION TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE SHROPSHIRE TRUST FOR NATURE CONSERVATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Gordon Scorer | Chair | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rory Lay | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Craig | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Lara Richardson | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Mandie Haywood | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Paul | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laurence David Kinnersley | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Diack | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER QUENTIN SHAW | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN GEORGE MARSH | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM SEAFORTH MONIE | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hearle | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES GERRARD DREVER | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALEX D GRANT | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mr R Owen | Trustee | 28 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
LADY VERONICA COSSONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.24m | £2.15m | £2.66m | £2.89m | £3.32m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.15m | £2.03m | £2.27m | £2.47m | £3.18m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £69.43k | £193.75k | £167.83k | £255.57k | £20.30k | |
|
Income from government grants | £84.39k | £415.68k | £844.83k | £630.55k | £250.29k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £514.09k | £441.39k | £1.02m | £682.67k | £752.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £114.83k | £38.45k | £67.56k | £122.11k | £128.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.61m | £1.67m | £1.58m | £2.09m | £2.42m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.00k | £165 | £40 | £1.87k | £20.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £30.58k | £10.15k | £487.00k | £24.65k | £188.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.76m | £1.66m | £1.84m | £2.24m | £2.91m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £382.77k | £362.03k | £432.69k | £230.65k | £264.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.80k | £8.75k | £9.81k | £9.64k | £5.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.82m | £2.90m | £2.94m | £2.94m | £2.94m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £45.83k | £48.39k | £98.03k | £103.00k | |
|
Other assets | £624.76k | £834.16k | £1.41m | £1.83m | £1.70m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £479.49k | £576.54k | £810.42k | £856.61k | £582.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JULY 1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 12 MARCH 1983 AND 12 JULY 1988 as amended on 07 Oct 2009 as amended on 06 May 2022 as amended on 27 Sep 2014 as amended on 09 Feb 2022 as amended on 09 Feb 2022 as amended on 24 Oct 2022 as amended on 20 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
2. OBJECTS 2.1 The Charity's objects ("Objects") are specifically restricted to the following: 2.2 To advance, promote and further the conservation and protection of nature reserves which shall be owned, maintained or managed by the Charity. 2.3 For the benefit of the public, to advance, promote and further the conservation, protection and enhancement of: (a) wildlife and its habitats (including terrestrial, marine and aquatic habitats); (b) areas of natural beauty or heritage; (c) areas of zoological, botanical, mycological or other biological scientific interest; (d) areas with geological, geographical, geomorphological, archaeological, physiographical or amenity value in particular, but not exclusively, in ways that further biodiversity. 2.4 To advance education and engagement, of both the general public and businesses, without compromising the ability of future generations to meet their own needs in: (a) the principles and practice of biodiversity and geodiversity conservation; (b) the principles and practice of sustainable development; (c) Nature based health and wellbeing initiatives; (d) Natural capital, and its protection, restoration and value to society; and (e) Natural solutions for climate change. 2.5 To promote, encourage and carry out study and research for the advancement of knowledge in the natural sciences, to make grants or donations for such purposes and to encourage and support the recording and publication of the useful results thereof.
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
193 ABBEY FOREGATE
SHREWSBURY
SY2 6AH
- Phone:
- 01743284280
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window