TOWN ESTATE CHARITY

Charity number: 212748
Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grant towards upkeep of St. Mary's, Grundisburgh Parish Church Grants including loans to individuals residing in Grundisburgh

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £6,495
Total expenditure: £5,371

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 January 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV CLARE SANDERS Chair 12 March 1996
ROBERT THINGE'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
SAMUEL TAYLOR DAWSONS'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
CHARITY OF JOHN LUCOCK
Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
ROBERT ALFRED FLETCHER Trustee 30 September 2012
SAMUEL TAYLOR DAWSONS'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
CHARITY OF JOHN LUCOCK
Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
ROBERT THINGE'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
JUDITH ANNE BIGNELL Trustee
ROBERT THINGE'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
SAMUEL TAYLOR DAWSONS'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
CHARITY OF JOHN LUCOCK
Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.88k £6.17k £6.28k £5.15k £6.50k
Total expenditure £4.73k £5.04k £5.40k £4.32k £5.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 December 2021 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24 Post Mill Gardens
Grundisburgh
WOODBRIDGE
Suffolk
IP13 6UP
Phone:
01473 735 775
Website:

No information available