THE FAKENHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 212779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Assisting, with either grants of money or purchasing goods and services, persons resident in the town of Fakenham and the area of the ancient parish of Hempton who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,531
Total expenditure: £3,434

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel Andrews Chair 09 July 2019
THE GOGGS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
HARRISON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LADY MARY TOWNSHEND
Received: On time
Rev Tracy Jessop Trustee 11 October 2022
THE GOGGS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
HARRISON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LADY MARY TOWNSHEND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, FAKENHAM
Received: On time
Richard Lynam Trustee 13 July 2021
THE GOGGS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
HARRISON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LADY MARY TOWNSHEND
Received: On time
Adam Russell BUNKLE Trustee 13 October 2020
VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
RICHARD MANSEUR
Received: On time
LADY MARY TOWNSHEND
Received: On time
HARRISON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Gillian Rose Foortse Trustee 23 May 2017
THE GOGGS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
LADY MARY TOWNSHEND
Received: On time
HARRISON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.60k £12.96k £4.83k £5.37k £5.53k
Total expenditure £4.51k £5.63k £4.15k £4.15k £3.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 Poppyfields
FAKENHAM
Norfolk
NR21 8PZ
Phone:
07837255905
Website:

No information available