Accounts and annual returns CENTRE FOR THE DEAF - BRISTOL

Charity number: 212783
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 12 September 2016 225 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 12 September 2016 225 days late
Annual return 31 March 2014 12 September 2016 590 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 12 September 2016 590 days late