NATIONAL COUNCIL OF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS (INCORPORATED)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
YMCA England & Wales supports and represents YMCAs all over England and Wales, helping them transform communities so that all young peoply truly belong, contribute and thrive. By working with YMCAs that understand local issues, the YMCA Movement in England & Wales meets the real needs of young people, supporting them in a way which is nationally significant but locally relevant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£22,759,000
Donations and legacies | £3.67m | |
Charitable activities | £1.29m | |
Other trading activities | £16.97m | |
Investments | £826.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£22,718,000
Raising funds | £2.29m | |
Charitable activities | £5.40m | |
Other | £15.03m |
£581,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £17.32m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.40m | |
Retained for future use | £41.00k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £17.32m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.40m | |
Retained for future use | £622.00k |
People

469 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
1200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 6 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 November 1986: Standard registration
- YMCA England and Wales (Working name)
- YMCA ENGLAND (Previous name)
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roy Langley O'Shaughnessy | Chair | 05 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Joshua James Walker- Brooks | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Alex Elizabeth Taylor | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Antony Peter Forrester-Brown | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher John Stern | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Hanna Sebright | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Gillian Sewell | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Jonathan Rowe | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Ross Hendry | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dawn Patricia Ward CBE, DL | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|||||||||
PETER CHARLES EDWARD CALDERBANK | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Emma White | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.42m | £14.37m | £17.59m | £21.74m | £22.76m | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.81m | £14.62m | £17.06m | £20.72m | £22.72m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £674.00k | £578.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.85m | £345.22k | £1.16m | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.22m | £3.52m | £3.04m | £3.79m | £3.67m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £9.64m | £7.99m | £12.54m | £15.93m | £16.97m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.36m | £1.28m | £1.82m | £1.77m | £1.29m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £196.00k | £246.00k | £181.00k | £243.00k | £826.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £1.33m | £0 | £13.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.01m | £858.00k | £559.00k | £1.23m | £626.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.84m | £4.69m | £4.77m | £5.43m | £5.40m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.39m | £1.43m | £1.36m | £1.62m | £2.29m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £507.00k | £86.07k | £177.66k | £68.00k | £69.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £536.00k | £2.17m | £1.65m | £1.91m | £1.47m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £9.58m | £8.50m | £10.93m | £13.67m | £15.03m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £827.00k | £572.00k | £541.00k | £662.00k | £713.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £8.32m | £11.38m | £12.47m | £12.14m | £12.72m | |
|
Other assets | £7.89m | £7.10m | £7.23m | £6.55m | £4.77m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£6.28m | -£7.25m | -£7.00m | -£6.18m | -£2.41m | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.08m | £5.73m | £5.29m | £4.72m | £3.96m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 1902 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 18 JUL 1952, 8 FEB 1975, 28 MAR 1980, 3 APR 1987, 28 FEB 1991, 24 MAR 1995, 17 OCT 1998, 18 OCT 2003, 24 NOV 2007, 10 APR 2010 & 20 NOV. 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/01/2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 DEC 2017 as amended on 06 Jun 2019 as amended on 03 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
10.4 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, INCLUDING BY: (I) PROMOTING A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT INSPIRED AND MOTIVATED BY THE LIFE, EXAMPLE AND TEACHING OF JESUS CHRIST, WHERE PEOPLE OF FAITH AND PEOPLE OF NONE CAN WORK TOGETHER FOR THE TRANSFORMATION OF COMMUNITIES; AND (II) ENABLING PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE, TO FLOURISH THROUGH EXPERIENCING AND RESPONDING TO THE LOVE OF GOD DEMONSTRATED BY THE LIFE, EXAMPLE AND TEACHING OF JESUS CHRIST; 10.5 TO FURTHER THE CAUSE AND WORK OF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD; 10.6 TO SUPPORT, REPRESENT AND DEVELOP THE WORK OF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS IN ENGLAND AND WALES; 10.7 TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 10.8 TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE, WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES; 10.9 TO RELIEVE AND PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL, SPIRITUAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND 10.10 TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL HOUSING, FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE, WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL, SPIRITUAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Linked charities
- 03 November 1986 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
YMCA England and Wales
Welken House
10-11 Charterhouse Square
LONDON
EC1M 6EH
- Phone:
- 0207 186 9500
- Email:
- companysecretary@ymca.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window