PARISH CHURCH HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church Meetings, community activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnet
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 06 December 1962: Standard registration
- CHURCH HOUSE (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JOHN WEST | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Bruce Stringer | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Vivien Stringer | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
lynn Oldham | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DIANE DE NAEYER | Trustee | 06 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.75k | £75.23k | £75.95k | £89.89k | £95.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.75k | £90.45k | £81.00k | £115.08k | £87.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
03 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 17TH SEPTEMBER 1920 as amended on 18 Jan 2017 as amended on 18 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
BUILDING TO BE USED FOR: (1) SUNDAY SCOOL CLASSES FOR THE RELIGOUS EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS OR RELIGIOUS SERVICES IN CONNEXION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND UNDER THE EXCLUSIVE DIRECTION OF THE SAID RECTOR; (2) LECTURES IN CONNEXION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND UNDER THE SAME DIRECTION; (3) CLERICAL MEETINGS, CONFERENCES 'SOCIAL OR OTHERWISE) OF CLERGY AND LAITY, COMMITTEE MEETINGS IN CONNEXION WITH ORGANISATIONS AFFECTING THE WELFARE OF CHURCH OR PARISH UNDER THE SAME DIRECTION; (4) SUCH OTHER LECTURES AND MEETINGS AND SUCH PARAOCHIAL SOCIAL OR OTHER FUNCTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH HOUSE
WOOD STREET
BARNET
EN5 4BW
- Phone:
- 020 8449 4704
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window