MISS E M HITCHCOCK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities -- Church of England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £313 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 15 July 1963: Standard registration
- THE PCC OF CREETING ST MARY (SUFFOLK) (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV PHILIP PAYNE | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Brame | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Susan Oakley | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL JOHN SMART | Trustee | 17 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MAY LOUISA ALDRED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID STRACEY HAYNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLYNIS ANNE CLINT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.78k | £16.20k | £17.06k | £19.40k | £18.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.27k | £13.04k | £16.52k | £17.03k | £18.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.16k | £3.42k | N/A | £623 | £313 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF 1961
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CREETING ST MARY
Contact information
- Address:
-
CREETING HILLS FARM
CREETING HILLS
CREETING ST. MARY
IPSWICH
IP6 8PZ
- Phone:
- 01449722570
- Email:
- davidshaynes@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window