Financial history THE EGREMONT AND SOMERSET ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity Number: 212864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £154.25k £178.99k £188.77k £203.88k £194.45k
Total expenditure £102.39k £95.74k £118.44k £154.64k £185.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A