TOWN LANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust makes of grants to individuals or groups for instance via Christmas fuel or grocery vouchers to old age pensioners living alone in the parish and a grant to the village Over 70s Dinner Fund. Its Apprenticeship Fund helps young people with expenses incurred on further or higher education, apprenticeships or training courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 April 1970: Standard registration
- TOWN LANDS TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUZANNE LEWIS | Chair | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Leslie Siu | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Foden | Trustee | 11 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Pauline Barley | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|||||
JENNY CATCHPOLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID HALL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/11/2019 | 29/11/2020 | 29/11/2021 | 29/11/2022 | 29/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.84k | £5.08k | £5.17k | £5.33k | £5.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.85k | £4.39k | £4.26k | £4.19k | £5.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 November 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 November 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 November 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 November 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 November 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF THE 27TH OCTOBER 1916 AND 17TH FEBRUARY 1970 AS AFFECTED BY A RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74(2)(C) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 6 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
I. ONE FIFTH OF THE INCOME TO BE APPLIED TO THE BARKER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (WHICH IS UNDER THE JURISDICTION OF THE MINISTRY OF EDUCATION.II. ONE FIFTH OF THE INCOME FOR THE REPAIR OF FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH AND UPKEEP OF THE CHURCHYARD.III. ONE TENTH FOR APPRENTICING POOR CHILDREN.IV REMAINING INCOME FOR RELIEF IN NEED AND THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WICKHAM MARKET.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WICKHAM MARKET
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Fir Close
Wickham Market
Woodbridge
IP13 0UB
- Phone:
- 01728746979
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window