THE JOHN NEWTON PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To use all available media to revive an interest in the Word of God and to encourage an acceptance of Jesus Christ as Saviour and Lord.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 January 1963: Standard registration
- FACT AND FAITH FILMS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE SWALES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Julia Cameron | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Todd Murray | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ed Veale | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Virgo | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
LT CDR MARTIN HINES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.71k | £5.14k | £8.15k | £3.41k | £5.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.06k | £5.28k | £6.33k | £7.23k | £7.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/05/1948 AS AMENDED ON 21/01/1952 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 04/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 18/03/2013
Charitable objects
TO USE ALL AVAILABLE MEDIA TO REVIVE AN INTEREST IN THE WORD OF GOD AND TO ENCOURAGE AN ACCEPTANCE OF JESUS CHRIST AS SAVIOUR AND LORD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
90 Polwell Lane
Barton Seagrave
KETTERING
NN15 6UB
- Phone:
- 01536726401
- Email:
- admin@johnnewton.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window