Governing document BRAINTREE AND BOCKING PUBLIC GARDENS
Charity number: 212989

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 16/11/1888 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 06/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 04/10/2005 AS AMENDED ON 01/06/2006 AS AMENDED ON 03/08/2010 AS AMENDED ON 07/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 07/02/2012
Charitable objects
PUBLIC GARDENS FOR GENERAL BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BRAINTREE AND BOCKING.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.