GREAT BADDOW PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity Number: 213004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity makes grants to organisations and individuals for the relief of poverty and for general purposes for those with a connection to the ancient parish of Great Baddow. Grants are made to the general public but mostly to elderly (over 55's) and those with disabilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £46,425
Total expenditure: £23,892

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 January 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Peter Fuller Chair 23 April 2021
None on record
Valerie Chiswell Trustee 15 December 2023
ROTARY CLUB OF CHELMSFORD MILDMAY TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF HYLANDS HOUSE
Received: On time
MRS H PUGH FOR SUNDAY OR DAY SCHOOLS
Received: On time
DEAN BRAMSTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
John Ansell Trustee 18 May 2023
DEAN BRAMSTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT BADDOW, ST MARY THE VIRGIN
Received: On time
MRS H PUGH FOR SUNDAY OR DAY SCHOOLS
Received: On time
Anne Winder Trustee 23 June 2021
DEAN BRAMSTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
MRS H PUGH FOR SUNDAY OR DAY SCHOOLS
Received: On time
Rev Philip Sheldrake Trustee 04 March 2020
DEAN BRAMSTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
MRS H PUGH FOR SUNDAY OR DAY SCHOOLS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £38.99k £40.79k £37.54k £39.15k £46.43k
Total expenditure £21.63k £29.87k £24.30k £28.89k £23.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 6 OCTOBER 1986
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF OR HAVE AT ANY TIME BEEN RESIDENT IN FOR NOT LESS THAN FIVE YEARS THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF GREAT BADDOW.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF GREAT BADDOW
Registration history
  • 31 January 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
70 EASTWOOD PARK
GREAT BADDOW
CHELMSFORD
CM2 8HF
Phone:
01245901028
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available