THE NETHERLANDS BENEVOLENT SOCIETY KONING WILLEM FONDS

Charity number: 213032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To render assistance to Dutch citizens living in the UK, irrespective of race and/or religion

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £39,981
Total expenditure: £71,610

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 October 1963: Standard registration
  • 09 April 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KONING WILLEM FONDS (Working name)
  • THE NETHERLANDS BENEVOLENT SOCIETY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LOUISE GERARDA VAN HELLENBERG HUBAR Chair
None on record
Sabine Taal Trustee 01 February 2023
DUTCH MASTERS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Angelique Hyacinthe Schoots Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Benjamin Nathanja Timotheus Lahnstein Trustee 22 April 2020
None on record
Elisabeth de Boer Trustee 22 April 2020
None on record
Wouter Van Aken Trustee 22 April 2020
FRIENDS OF ST MARY ABBOTS SCHOOL
Received: On time
Marian Berden Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Maria Catharina Johanna Sketchley-Kneppelhout Trustee 07 February 2018
None on record
Dr Maud Nauta Trustee 04 October 2017
None on record
Bert Jan van de Lagemaat Trustee 04 October 2017
None on record
Aarnout Snouck Hurgronje Trustee 27 June 2016
None on record
Barones Reina Maria Henriette Renee Van Pallandt-Reichling Trustee 12 March 2012
None on record
DERK HARTMAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £64.53k £37.43k £41.05k £43.28k £39.98k
Total expenditure £52.15k £63.13k £49.87k £56.03k £71.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RESOLUTION OF GOVERNORS OF NETHERLANDS BENEVOLENT SOCIETY OF 4 JUNE 1969 AND 6 SEPTEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE BENEFITS IN ANY FORM THOUGHT APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES FOR MEMBERS OF THE NETHERLANDS ARMED FORCES STATIONED OR VISITING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND NORTHERN IRELAND WHO ARE IN NEED THEREOF. (B) TO PROVIDE BENEFITS IN ANY FORM NOW OR IN THE FUTURE AUTHORISED BY THE STATUTES OF THIS SOCIETY FOR PERSONS OF NETHERLANDS EXTRACTION AND THEIR WIVES, WIDOWS AND DEPENDANTS RESIDENT OR TEMPORARILY PRESENT IN THE UNITED KINGDON AND NORTHERN IRELAND WHO ARE IN NEED THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 15 October 1963 : Standard registration
  • 09 April 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
The Netherlands Benevolent Society
7 Austin Friars
LONDON
EC2N 2HA
Phone:
07915110590