NOVERS PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the well being of the community area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 21 February 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Vowles | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Oaten | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROYSTON DENNIS DERRICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.75k | £3.93k | £11.32k | £25.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.06k | £5.25k | £9.80k | £19.00k | £19.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2022 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 February 2021 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION MARCH 27.1951 CLAUSE 18 (REGARDING DISSOLUTION) ADDED AND APPROVED AT ANNUAL GENERAL MEETING, SEPTEMBER 12, 1962.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF THE COMMUNITY AREA. TO FURTHER HEALTH, TO FURTHER EDUCATION TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION, AND SOCIAL,MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT, AND TO FOSTER A COMMUNITY SPIRIT FOR THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THESE AND OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE. TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUNTRE. TO DO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE OF SUCH A CENTRE.
Area of benefit
NOVERS PARK, BRISTOL 4
Contact information
- Address:
-
Novers Park Community Association
Rear Of
122-124 Novers Park Road
BRISTOL
BS4 1RN
- Phone:
- 01179665232
- Email:
- npca2015@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window