Financial history THE WELFARE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 213062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.55k £3.60k £3.99k £4.44k £4.59k
Total expenditure £4.54k £6.54k £4.54k £540 £4.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A