VICTORIA HOMES (1998) BEXLEY

Charity Number: 213067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity administers 6 single storey terraced almshouses. Accommodation is for independent living and single occupancy. 'Beneficiaries' are those in need, hardship or distress, with priority being given to the aged. The upto date 'area of benefit' is described elsewhere.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £16,830
Total expenditure: £15,082

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bexley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 1963: Standard registration
  • 05 May 1999: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 05 May 1999: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE VICTORIA HOMES BEXLEY (Working name)
  • HOME FOR THE AGED POOR OTHERWISE KNOWN AS THE VICTORIA HOMES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PASTOR RICHARD GEORGE WELLS Chair 14 September 2020
None on record
Marion Smith Trustee 08 June 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, BEXLEY
Received: On time
Valerie Elizabeth FOX Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
SARATH NANDANA JAYASINGHE Trustee 09 September 2021
None on record
Carol Marie Christine Anderson Trustee 22 July 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.68k £13.98k £15.44k £16.12k £16.83k
Total expenditure £12.63k £14.01k £21.53k £6.80k £15.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 March 2024 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 20 JANUARY 1923 AND CODICIL DATED 8 DECEMBER 1923 (UV 251 PAGE 453) AND RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74(2) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE DISTRIBUTED ANNUALLY AT CHRISTMAS AMONG THE OCCUPATS OF THE HOMOS IN EQUAL SHARES.
Area of benefit
BEXLEY
Registration history
  • 25 February 1963 : Standard registration
  • 05 May 1999 : Removed
  • 05 May 1999 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
47 KNOLL ROAD
BEXLEY
DA5 1AY
Phone:
01322550482
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available