Governing document THE BRITISH ENTOMOLOGICAL AND NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BYE-LAWS ADOPTED 23 MAY 1929 AS LAST AMENDED 25 JANUARY 1968 AND 10 APRIL 1994 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAR 2014 as amended on 30 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF BIOLOGICAL RESEARCH, EDUCATION AND CONSERVATION WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON ENTOMOLOGY AND NATURAL HISTORY, BY MEANS OF MEETINGS IN THE SOCIETY'S ROOMS AND ELSEWHERE FOR THE READING OF ORIGINAL PAPERS, DISCUSSIONS AND LECTURES, BY PUBLIC EXHIBITION, BY FIELD MEETINGS, BY THE ISSUE OF PUBLICATIONS, THE FORMATION OF TYPICAL COLLECTIONS AND OF A LIBRARY, AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE COUNCIL OF THE SOCIETY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.