Financial history THE DEPTFORD ST PAUL CHARITY

Charity number: 213171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £41.02k £41.85k £41.85k £42.32k £45.62k
Total expenditure £31.19k £31.20k £31.20k £37.17k £36.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A