THE DEPTFORD ST PAUL CHARITY

Charity number: 213171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The area of benefit is the Ancient Parish of Deptford, Saint Paul. To provide discretionary grants for the relief of those in need. To pay monthly pensions to pensioners resident in the area of benefit) who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £45,619
Total expenditure: £36,340

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Lewisham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 April 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Josephine Rachael Ashdown Trustee 25 April 2024
LONDON CITY BRASS
Received: On time
Cllr William Paul Cooper Trustee 18 October 2023
None on record
Rev Owen Beament Trustee
THE DEPTFORD PENSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX DRUG REHABILITATION CENTRE FOR WOMEN WITH CHILDREN
Received: On time
Rev Paul David Butler B.A. HONS. Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF S. PAUL, DEPTFORD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £41.02k £41.85k £41.85k £42.32k £45.62k
Total expenditure £31.19k £31.20k £31.20k £37.17k £36.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 December 2023 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 December 2023 310 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
London Borough of Lewisham
Laurence House
Catford
LONDON
SE6 4RU
Phone:
020 8314 7074
Website:

No information available