THE WITHAM AMBULANCE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Witham Ambulance Trust makes small grants to individuals to assist with the expenses of travelling to hospital to visit long term sick relatives or to attend hospital as an out patient. The Trust is only able to assist residents of Witham and the surrounding villages. Please contact the Trust for further details
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Essex
Governance
- 11 January 1967: Standard registration
- 10 July 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 10 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1077265-1 ST JOHN AMBULANCE
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55 | £1.57k | £2 | £1 | £3 | |
|
Total expenditure | £741 | £208 | £350 | £60 | £624 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 07 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 26 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 27 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 1ST MARCH 1921 AND SCHEME OF THE 17TH NOVEMBER 1966.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST POOR OR DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS TO BE CONVEYED BY THE AMBULANCE PRESENTED BY CHARLES HEDLEY STRUTT TO WITHAM URBAN DISTRICT COUNCIL, OR BY SIMILAR OR OTHER MEANS, TO ANY NECESSARY HOSPITAL, INFIRMARY, OR CONVALESCENT HOME WILLING TO RECEIVE SUCH PERSONS, AND IN RELIEVING IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT AS AFORESAID WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES WHICH ARE CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OR ASSIST THE RECOVERY OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH CASES BUT ARE NOT READILY AVAILABLE TO THEM FROM OTHER SOURCES.
Area of benefit
WITHAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window