HOSPITAL OF SIR JOHN HAWKINS, KNIGHT, IN CHATHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Under the Statutory Instrument of 1983 and Scheme Amendment of 1996, the provision of well maintained almshouse accommodation for the relief of needy or disabled persons who have served in the; Royal Navy, Royal Marines, WRNS QARNNS, Royal Fleet Auxiliary, Merchant Navy, Army, Royal Air Force or has been employed in HM Dockyards on the construction, maintenance, refitting or repair of HM Ships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Medway
Governance
- 01 March 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt Cdr STEPHEN SMALL | Chair | 07 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Jarrett | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Patrick O'Kane | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Gamp | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA JANE LOWTON | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cdre BARRY WILLIAM BRYANT | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HERBERT REYNOLDS | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK LOUIS MORGAN | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER HUW GILBERT | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN Stephen Mark GOBBI JP MA LLB | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.17k | £51.28k | £61.49k | £61.09k | £67.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.25k | £38.06k | £55.77k | £50.64k | £52.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 27TH AUGUST 1594 AND S.I. 1983 NO. 1910 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 1 NOVEMBER 1999.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR NEEDY OR DISABLED PERSONS WHO HAVE SERVED EITHER IN THE ROYAL NAVY, THE ROYAL MARINES, THE WOMEN'S ROYAL NAVAL SERVICE OR THE QUEEN ALEXANDRA'S ROYAL NAVAL NURSING SERVICE, OR WHO HAVE SERVED AND HAVE BEEN MOBILISED FOR ACTIVE SERVICE IN ANY OF THE RESERVE FORCES OR BODIES OF THE ROYAL NAVY OR ROYAL MARINES, OR WHO HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN ANY OF HER MAJESTY'S DOCKYARDS OR NAVAL BASES DIRECTLY ON THE CONSTRUCTION, MAINTENANCE, RE-FITTING OR REPAIR OF ANY OF HER MAJESTY'S SHIPS AND VESSELS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEPUTY GOVERNOR
HOSPITAL OF SIR JOHN HAWKINS
KNIGHT IN CHATHAM
HIGH STREET
CHATHAM KENT
ME4 4EW
- Phone:
- 01474365088
- Email:
- hawkinshospital@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window