GRUNDYS CHARITY FOR POOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Charity are to consider the application of deserving people for the purpose of improving education, training or skill and for grants to people in adversity, illness, infirmity or old age. Applications are limited to persons who were born in, or who for the last ten years have lived in, the former counties of Lancashire and Westmorland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 28 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Rigby | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Francis Donnelly | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Bernadette Kathleen Cowley | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MR R BINGHAM | Trustee |
|
||||||||
LOUIS SHAW | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.46k | £12.29k | £10.88k | £13.59k | £13.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.67k | £9.41k | £8.72k | £8.80k | £16.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT THE P.P.R. ON THE 21 JANUARY 1947. SCHEME OF THE 30 NOVEMBER 1954 AND 30 OCTOBER 1974.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS BORN OR FOR AT LEAST TEN CONSECUTIVE YEARS RESIDENT IN THE FORMER COUNTIES OF LANCASTER OR WESTMORLAND.
Area of benefit
THE FORMER COUNTIES OF LANCASTER AND WESTMORLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vincents solicitors
21-23 Park Street
Lytham St. Annes
FY8 5LU
- Phone:
- 01253 733101
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window