Financial history SHORTHORN SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 213216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £116.39k £116.63k £130.32k £219.73k £85.59k
Total expenditure £111.48k £91.88k £96.10k £164.98k £129.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A