Trustees SHORTHORN SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Charity number: 213216

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam John Lawson | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Edward Dixon | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Reilly | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Armstrong | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Charles Moscrop | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Florence Mannerings | Trustee | 17 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Madeley | Trustee | 17 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
David George Wainwright | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GEORGE KITE | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WINNINGTON | Trustee | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Slade | Trustee | 28 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian Richard George Collins | Trustee | 16 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
SEIMON VIVIAN BOWEN THOMAS | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER AMY ELUNED DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENNIS HENRY CRAIG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN RAYMOND FISHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARTHUR HENRY JAMES WHITTLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
WENDY ANN YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN PEARN WYATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWYNDAF JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.