Accounts and annual returns THE SIR THOMAS LIPTON CHARITY

Charity number: 213300
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2009 28 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 28 July 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 04 May 2010 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 30 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 07 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 30 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 22 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 27 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 04 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 08 September 2006 On Time