GEORGIAN SOCIETY FOR EAST YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 213302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Monitoring of and commenting on planning applications which have an impact on buildings in Kingston upon Hull and the East Riding of Yorkshire from the Georgian era. Supporting the publication of books and archiving of material with relevance to the Georgian era in Kingston upon Hull and the East Riding of Yorkshire. Organising visits to buildings & talks with Georgian connections.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £43,940
Total expenditure: £25,850

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire
  • Kingston Upon Hull City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR ROGER LEWIS Chair
None on record
Dr Susan Anne Neave Trustee 04 September 2024
THE FRIENDS OF BEVERLEY MINSTER
Received: On time
DAVID ALEXANDER PENNIE Trustee 04 September 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, COTTINGHAM (DIOCESE OF YORK)
Received: On time
Iris Lilian Pennie Trustee 04 September 2024
None on record
Miss V Coss Trustee 21 May 2018
None on record
Mrs O Hirst Trustee 17 February 2018
None on record
DR DAVID RICHARD JOSEPH NEAVE Trustee 08 February 2014
None on record
ARTHUR GRAVES CREDLAND Trustee 08 February 2014
EAST YORKSHIRE LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER ROBERT MEAD Trustee
None on record
Rev Canon Stephen Deas Trustee
MOTHER HUMBER MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
THE HART MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
HULL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
ALDERMAN COGAN'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ALDERMAN FERRIES CHARITY (HULL UNITED CHARITIES)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.23k £1.25k £68.04k £163.61k £43.94k
Total expenditure £3.56k £917 £10.78k £2.63k £25.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 Minster Court
Holderness Road
HULL
HU8 9EA
Phone:
01482784564
Email:
No information available