BRITISH MOTOR CYCLE RACING CLUB BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief and assistance to members and associates of British Motorcycle Racing Club and others in distress, or suffering hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD MCDONALD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Keith Roissetter | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tina Hill | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY RINGROW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.92k | £2.20k | £7.90k | £13.26k | £15.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.75k | £4.50k | £13.60k | £9.58k | £6.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF DISTRESS AMONG MEMBERS OF BRITISH MOTOR CYCLE RACING CLUB OR THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS DURING SICKNESS, INFIRMITY OR OTHER INCAPACITY OF SUCH MEMBERS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Warren Farm Cottages
Nightingales Lane
CHALFONT ST. GILES
Buckinghamshire
HP8 4SH
- Phone:
- 01708 720305
- Email:
- mikedommett@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window