Accounts and annual returns WALPOLE LODGE (NO 1500) BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 213316
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2011 15 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2010 06 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required