THE LIVERPOOL STOCK EXCHANGE CLERKS' PROVIDENT ASSOCIATION-BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 February 1963: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST, DATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1956
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A BENEVOLENT FUND TO BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY MEMBER OR FORMER MEMBER AND ALSO THE HUSBAND WIFE CHILD OR OTHER DEPENDANT OF ANY MEMBER OR FORMER MEMBER OR OF ANY DECEASED MEMBER OR FORMER MEMBER WHO IS BY REASON OF HIS OR HER FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES NEEDY AND DESERVING OF ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
LIVERPOOL AND NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window