THE FURNITURE BROKERS' BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing small annuities to persons retired from the auctioneering and furniture retailing trades
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 April 1963: Standard registration
- 05 March 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £312 | £312 | £313 | £156 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £600 | £600 | £400 | £300 | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 08 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 01 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 01 March 2013 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND REGULATIONS AS AMENDED 27TH NOVEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
(A)RELIEVING THE PHYSICAL WANTS AND NECESSITIES OF PERSONS IN POOR CIRCUMSTANCES PARTICULARLY THOSE CONNECTED WITH THE FURNITURE AND ALLIED TRADES, AND THEIR WIDOWS AND ORPHANS. (B) TO CARRY ON ANY AND EVERY CLASS OF WORK WHICH MAY BE OF BENEFIT TO THEM.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window