THE ARAB HORSE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve & improve the standard of horses & ponies in GB and to prevent cruelty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 21 November 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE SUSSEX | Chair | 12 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Jean Mary Crozier | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donna Gambrill | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Atkinson | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Hateley | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Bowles | Trustee | 25 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca McCormick | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Irene Compton | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Grant Chivers | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE MEREDITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOANNE LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £318.17k | £150.35k | £226.15k | £216.05k | £222.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £324.12k | £206.07k | £259.20k | £274.29k | £290.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION OF 1967 AS AMENDED 27 APRIL 1993, 20 APRIL 1996 AND 20 APRIL 2002.
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE GENERAL STANDARD OF HORSES AND PONIES WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE ARAB HORSE BY PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE BREEDING AND IMPORTING OF PURE BRED ARAB HORSES AND THE INTRODUCTION OF ARAB BLOOD INTO BRITISH LIGHT HORSE BREEDING. (2) TO IMPROVE GENERAL STANDARDS IN THE MANAGEMENT USE AND TREATMENT OF HORSES AND PONIES WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE SPECIAL FEATURES OF THE ARAB HORSE BY THE EDUCATION OF BREEDERS IMPORTERS OWNERS JUDGES VETERINARIANS TRAINERS AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC. (3) TO PROMOTE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE THE USE OF HORSES AND PONIES FOR RECREATIONAL PURPOSES BY MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AND BY THOSE FOR WHOM BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE DISABILITY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES RIDING OR OTHER ACTIVITIES INVOLVING HORSES OR PONIES PROVIDE SPECIAL BENEFITS. (4) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO HORSES AND PONIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 21 November 1967 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Agriculture House
Charnham Lane
Hungerford
Hungerford
Berkshire
RG17 0EY
- Phone:
- 01672 521411
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window