Trustees THE ARAB HORSE SOCIETY
Charity Number: 213366

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Gerald Tolchard | Trustee | 03 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kyle William Jan Birchnall Skipper | Trustee | 03 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jean Mary Crozier | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donna Gambrill | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Hateley | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Bowles | Trustee | 25 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca McCormick | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE SUSSEX | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Irene Compton | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Grant Chivers | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE MEREDITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOANNE LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.