MUNICIPAL CHARITIES AND OTHERS

Charity number: 213397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of poverty in the old Borough of Lydd only

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £17,025
Total expenditure: £16,800

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 December 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Darren Chapman Trustee 06 May 2023
None on record
Martin Frank Sweeney Trustee 10 May 2021
None on record
Marc Wood-Brignall Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Robert Stanley Jones Trustee 10 October 2015
None on record
Clive Nicholas Goddard Trustee 04 November 2013
None on record
DAVID TOM FRANK BOURNE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.58k £16.48k £16.89k £17.89k £17.02k
Total expenditure £16.66k £15.04k £17.44k £16.80k £16.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES 24 OCTOBER 1933 17 OCTOBER 1956
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF POOR.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF LYDD
Registration history
  • 03 December 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Dunbeath House
Robin Hood Lane
Lydd
Romney Marsh
TN29 9HX
Phone:
01797321361
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available