Accounts and annual returns ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF FRANCES BARBER

Charity Number: 213451
Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 November 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required