WARWICKSHIRE MARK BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide relief of distressed Mark Master Masons or their dependants. To meet present day needs of freemasons and all connected therewith as well as supporting the masonic principle of helping others and providing assistance and aid of an emergency or charitable nature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 06 December 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR JAMES STEPHEN WRIGHT | Chair |
|
||||||
James Richard Freakley | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Crees | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Howard Leslie Smith | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|||||
David Philip Fair | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Belsham | Trustee | 21 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Edwin Austin Watkin | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Rowland Armbrister | Trustee | 21 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL FRANK MASON | Trustee | 21 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mr R Nigel Clemson | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID EVANS | Trustee | 07 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
CEDRIC FRANK STILES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.77k | £13.89k | £25.19k | £26.79k | £40.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.08k | £10.36k | £10.04k | £12.90k | £35.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES PASSED 02/12/1929 AS AMENDED BY CONSTITUTION DATED 26/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 21/11/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A RELIEF FUND FOR AND SUPPORT TO OTHER MASONIC AVENUES OF FINANCIAL RELIEF FOR THE BENEFICIARIES; AND TO MAKE DONATIONS FROM THE FUND TO MASONIC AND NON-MASONIC CHARITIES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
20
Henley Crescent
West Midlands
SOLIHULL
West Midlands
B91 2JD
- Phone:
- 07968019073
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window