ROYAL GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF CORNWALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage the popular study of geology and related sciences, with special reference to the geology and mining interests of Cornwall; to afford opportunities for instruction and to preserve geological knowledge in the society's Transactions and encourage via the website the publishing of papers regarding Cornish Geology and to encourage geological field meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cornwall
Governance
- 29 January 1963: Standard registration
- 06 February 1997: Removed
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £1.86k | £1.99k | £885 | £1.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.39k | £1.26k | £807 | £0 | £1.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND BYE-LAWS 1948 AS AMENDED 7TH DECEMBER 1996, 4 DECEMBER 1999 AND 7 DECEMBER 2002 as amended on 19 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF GEOLOGY WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THE MINING INTERESTS OF THE COUNTY. TO ENCOURAGE THE POPULAR STUDY OF GEOLOGY AND ALLIED SCIENCES AS A CULTURAL SUBJECT. TO AFFORD INSTRUCTION IN THE SCIENCE AND TO PRESERVE GEOLOGICAL KNOWLEDGE IN ITS TRANSACTIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 29 January 1963 : Standard registration
- 06 February 1997 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window