Accounts and annual returns DENVER POOR'S LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 213507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 March 2025 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 March 2025 405 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 March 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required