SUDBURY MUNICIPAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 213516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Distribution of Christmas Day Gifts (vouchers to purchase clothing) to men aged 75 and over and Ascension Day Gifts (vouchers to purchase food and clothing) to persons aged 75 and over. Grants to local organisations. All individuals must live in Sudbury, Suffolk. All organisations must benefit the inhabitants of Sudbury, Suffolk.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,244
Total expenditure: £5,840

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 November 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David William Dale Chair 13 July 2022
SUDBURY COMMON LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
FIONA MARGARET WHEELER Trustee 06 November 2024
SUDBURY COMMON LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
SUDBURY EPHEMERA ARCHIVE
Received: On time
William Roger Ford Trustee 17 July 2024
SUDBURY COMMON LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
Peter Leonard Fulcher Trustee 25 July 2018
SUDBURY COMMON LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
NORTH HINCKFORD TEAM
Received: On time
Samantha Jane Hobson Trustee 26 February 2014
SUDBURY COMMON LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
RICHARD WILLIAM KEMSLEY Trustee 25 July 2012
SUDBURY COMMON LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
ROSS BENTLEY Trustee 18 April 2012
None on record
MARK JAMES GEDDES Trustee
SUDBURY COMMON LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
REVEREND RICHARD KIMBER TITFORD Trustee
SUDBURY COMMON LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
PETER WHITELEY Trustee
SUDBURY COMMON LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
KEITH ROBINS Trustee
SUDBURY COMMON LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.15k £5.73k £6.16k £5.90k £7.24k
Total expenditure £5.18k £5.66k £8.44k £4.92k £5.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 6 AUGUST 1954
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF SUDBURY
Registration history
  • 22 November 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Christopher Centre
10 Gainsborough Street
Sudbury
Suffolk
CO10 2EU
Phone:
07905957608