THE BUTLIN & ELBOROW HOUSING TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provisionof almshouses in Rugby Warwickshire with a preference for women
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 01 January 1963: Standard registration
- 28 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- CATHERINE BUTLIN ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.70k | £19.25k | £16.57k | £17.93k | £18.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.80k | £20.23k | £18.10k | £21.98k | £18.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 14 December 2018 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 31 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 14 November 2017 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 05 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 9 JUNE 2010. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
1A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR POOR PERSONS; AND B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. 2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF RUGBY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window