Trustees THE CUFFLEY HALL
Charity number: 213603

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROY PAPWORTH | Chair | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Hollings | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Karl Moody | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Holding | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Goodwin Shields | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Field | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brent Cheetham | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL CROOK | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
LYN BAYNHAM | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Knight | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAT LOVATT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.