THE VICTORIA LEAGUE FOR COMMONWEALTH FRIENDSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of friendship within the Commonwealth and provide student accommodation to Commonwealth student at our London hostel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 March 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Steel | Chair | 05 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Lee McKenzie | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Barker | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Charles Richards Sir | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Samuel Ennis | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Patrick Wainwright | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dermot Peter Doughty | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Anne Lean Williamson | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Francis Layton | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £307.86k | £211.86k | £222.64k | £320.51k | £348.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £325.94k | £288.75k | £318.03k | £313.74k | £340.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION DATED 26 JANUARY 1921, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 16 FEBRUARY 1950, 27 MARCH 1958, 9 JULY 1962 AND 2 JULY 2008. as amended on 05 Jul 2023 as amended on 19 Jul 2023 as amended on 19 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is, for the public benefit, the advancement of education, particularly but not exclusively by: • providing assistance to individuals from the Commonwealth who are studying or who wish to study in the UK; • providing information relating to and raising awareness amongst the public of the Commonwealth, its people, institutions, traditions and ways of life; and • supporting educational programmes within the Commonwealth.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 LEINSTER SQUARE
LONDON
W2 4PU
- Phone:
- 02072432633
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window