Accounts and annual returns ANN SHAW TRUST

Charity number: 213624
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 14 January 2025 344 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 14 December 2023 312 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required