Accounts and annual returns DERBY SHIELD SOCIETY

Charity number: 213638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 07 August 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required