BRUNEL LODGE NO 7356 MASONIC BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 213648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To give assistance and support to members, their dependants or other similar charities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £892
Total expenditure: £710

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Bristol City
  • North Somerset
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 January 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • BRUNEL BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leo Hodgson Chair 01 September 2018
None on record
Wilf King Trustee 14 May 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £584 £27 £5.30k £2.46k £892
Total expenditure £689 £300 £5.08k £837 £710
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Freemasons of Bristol Brunel Lodge
31 Park Street
Bristol
Bristol
City of Bristol
BS1 5NH
Phone:
07549916518