Governing document THE CINEMA AND TELEVISION BENEVOLENT FUND
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
FOUNDED 1924 - CONSTITUTION AND RULES AS REVISED BY RESOLUTION ADOPTED AT ANNUAL GENERAL MEETINGS HELD ON THE 23 JUNE 1970, 11 OCTOBER 1972, 17 DECEMBER 1981, 19 JULY 1989, 9TH JULY 1993 AND 15TH JULY 1993
Charitable objects
ASSISTING AND RELIEVING MEMBERS OF THE CINEMATOGRAPH TRADE AND TELEVISION (OTHERWISE THAN THE MEMBERS OF THE BBC OR ITS SUCCESSORS) AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHEN IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES. ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING CONVALESCENT HOMES AND AFFORDING GENERALLY ASSISTANCE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.