THE MAYER TRUST

Charity number: 213700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing free-of-charge monthly public lectures, six per annum

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,104
Total expenditure: £1,698

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 November 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathryn Butler Trustee 12 February 2022
None on record
Viv Halliday Trustee 06 June 2021
None on record
HELEN JOY THOMAS Trustee 05 June 2019
None on record
PAUL BLEWES ROBERTSON Trustee 27 February 2013
None on record
KEVIN CHARLES SHARKEY Trustee 11 December 2012
None on record
DAVID RONALD BARNES Trustee
None on record
FRANK WHITTAKER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.89k £1.92k £1.95k £2.02k £2.10k
Total expenditure £1.15k £150 £1.55k £1.29k £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
89 STANTON ROAD
WIRRAL
CH63 3AT
Phone:
07766163626